Calip v. Tanigawa et al
Plaintiff: Sharla Calip
Defendant: Mary Tanigawa and Housing Authority of the County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2015cv02111
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER CERTIFYING APPEAL NOT TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH; REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/20/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from August 7, 2015 to October 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING LETTER REQUEST; EXTENDING DEADLINE TO PAY PARTIAL FILING FEE Plaintiff requests the Court "grant [her] fee waiver without payment" because her monthly expenses "can change" if she is evicted. As no such change s have occurred to date, the request is denied. The deadline for plaintiff to make the $100 partial payment of the initial filing fee is extended from June 5, 2015 to June 19, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS The application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied; plaintiff is further ordered to make partial payment of the filing fee in the amount of $100 no later than June 5, 2015. Failu re to pay this amount will result in dismissal of the above-entitled action without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby apprised of her responsibility to serve defendant with the complaint and any amendments, and the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines and attachments, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has a continuing obligation to keep the Court informed of her current address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 13, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calip v. Tanigawa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharla Calip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Tanigawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?