Klamut v. King City
Plaintiff: William Klamut
Defendant: King City
Case Number: 3:2015cv02132
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 90 Stipulation Dismissing Case. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 76 , 77 Motions in Limine. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/17/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall attend a settlement conference to take place within 60 days of this Order. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/29/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James re: 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order for Parties to Meet in Confer by August 9, 2016 (re: Dkt. No. 46 ). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/18/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO E-FILE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND EXHIBIT(S) REFERENCED IN 22 Reply. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/14/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/11/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/4/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2015. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/19/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klamut v. King City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Klamut
Represented By: Stanley Craig Goff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?