C.Doe v. Gast et al
Plaintiff: C. Doe
Defendant: James A. Gast and Thea J. Gast
Case Number: 3:2015cv02225
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPROVE AND FUND MINOR'S SETTLEMENT: Re 54 Proposed Order filed by C. Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/16/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL JANUARY 13, 2016: Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference Statements due January 6, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/17/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. J Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/21/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.Doe v. Gast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Doe
Represented By: Robert Stuart Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Gast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thea J. Gast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?