Zavala v. Holland

Petitioner: Mark Zavala
Respondent: Kim Holland
Case Number: 3:2015cv02247
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
May 4, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 24 Motion to Alter Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/8/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?