Ellis v. San Francisco State University

Plaintiff: Linda Ellis
Defendant: San Francisco State University
Case Number: 3:2015cv02273
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said action be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within sixty days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/19/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 11, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 08/11/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
March 15, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Ryu for a mandatory settlement conference. Discovery due by 10/3/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. He nderson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/17/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 7 days. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
December 22, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015).
July 7, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. San Francisco State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ellis
Represented By: Noah Daniel Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco State University
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?