Bernstein v. Virgin America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julia Bernstein
Defendant: Virgin America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02277
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 378 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND TO CONTINUE STAY OF EXECUTION AND ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 372 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment and Setting of Supersedeas Bond Amount; and to Extend Stay of Enforcement Pending Resolution of the Foregoing Issue filed by Virgin America, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 333 Motion for Sanctions. Request for fees and costs due by 11/16/2018. Objections due by 11/30/2018. Response due by 12/7/2018. Correction of Docket 345. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 333 Motion for Sanctions. Request for fees and costs due by 11/16/2018. Objections due by 11/30/2018. Response due by 12/7/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES re 341 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines filed by Julia Bernstein. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings due by 10/31/2018. Responses due by 11/14/2018. Replies due by 11/21/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial conference statement due by 2/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 1 :30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Bench Trial set for 3/4/2019 - 3/14/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 31, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 329 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Julia Bernstein. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Rule 37 motion regarding Defendants' Career Choice defense; 9/6/2018. Responses due by 9/27/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Deadline to file proposed stipulated judgment and/or any motion for judgment on the following issues: (1) revised damages report; (2) declaratory relief; (3) PAGA penalties 10/25/2018. Responses due 11/8/2018. Replies due 11/15/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING 225 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 286 Motion to Strike. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 293 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Julia Bernstein. Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/29/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 207 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES filed by Julia Bernstein. Deadline for production of rebuttal reports 12/27/2017. Deadline for completion of expert discovery 1/10/201 8. Deadline to file dispositive motions or motions to decertify 1/12/2018. Deadline to file oppositions to dispositive motions or motions to decertify 2/8/2018. Deadline to file replies in support of dispositive motions or motions to decertify 2/2 2/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 203 Defendant's Request to Obtain Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/23/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Admissibility of Documents and Depositions filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CERTAIN DEADLINES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 filed by Virgin America, Inc. Deadline for parties to finalize deposition schedule 9/29/2017. Fact discovery cut off 10/9/2017. Deadline for Defendant to provide responsive documents 10/9/2017. Deadline for completion of outstanding depositions 10/27/2017. Deadline for production of expert reports 11/10/2017. Deadline for production of rebuttal reports 12/1/2017. Deadline for completion expert discovery 12/12/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions or motions to decertify 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 186 Defendant's Discovery Request (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 156 Defendant's Request for Plaintiffs' Tax Returns. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017) Modified on 6/12/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2017 at 12:00 p.m. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC to February 15, 2017 filed by Julia Bernstein. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant Virgin America Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 70 Motion to Certify Class; denying 74 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Julia Bernstein. Joint Agenda due by 6/29/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2016 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Class Certification Briefing and Hearing filed by Julia Bernstein. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 26 Stipulation filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Virgin America, Inc. filed by Virgin America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein v. Virgin America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Bernstein
Represented By: Alison L. Kosinski
Represented By: Monique Olivier
Represented By: Emily Thiagaraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Represented By: Jennifer Adkins Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?