Total Recall Technologies v. Palmer Luckey, et al

Plaintiff: Total Recall Technologies
Defendant: Oculus VR, Inc. and Palmer Luckey
Case Number: 3:2015cv02281
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BILL OF COSTS re 218 Objection filed by Total Recall Technologies, 220 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC, 217 Bill of Costs filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 9, 2017 214 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 3, 2017 210 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 31, 2017 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 12, 2017 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/12/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
December 20, 2016 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/12/2017 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/5/2017 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
June 16, 2016 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS, re: 135 Status Report due by 1/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 6, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTIONS 157 133 152 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/6/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 26, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 17, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting in part and denying in part 131 Discovery Letter Brief. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 12, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING re 131 Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/12/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 4, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER QUESTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/4/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PARTIALLY STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/3/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 25, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING re 138 Discovery Letter Brief filed by id Software, LLC, Zenimax Media Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 138 Discovery Letter Brief : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/25/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 131 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/22/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STAY Show Cause Response due by 4/27/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/21/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 5, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/5/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 23, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 18, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Leave.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016) Modified on 3/18/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR A STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 10, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court CLARIFICATION RE COURT-ORDERED INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES, Motions terminated: 93 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Total Recall Technologies, 96 Discovery Letter Brief Response to TRT's March 2, 2016 Discovery Letter Motion filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC, 90 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 3, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 90 , 92 , 93 Motions terminated: 92 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC. Responses due by 3/7/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/3/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 1, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
January 16, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2016)
January 15, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, Motions terminated: 69 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Total Recall Technologies, 48 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC. Motion for leave to amend due by 1/29/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 5, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST RE UPCOMING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 29, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
November 2, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 66 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 13, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY LETTER AND VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re 59 Order on Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/13/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 8, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE re 52 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Palmer Luckey, Oculus VR, LLC, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 52 Discovery Letter Brief : Responses due by 10/9/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/8/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 5, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 50 Notice (Other) filed by Total Recall Technologies, 49 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Total Recall Technologies]. Response due by NOON on 10/8/2015. Three-hour meet- and-confer starting from 8:00 AM--11:00 AM on 10/13/2015 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 10/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/5/2015. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 2, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING COMMENT FROM DEFENDANTS re 40 Amended Complaint filed by Total Recall Technologies Responses due by 9/2/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/1/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 3, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 23 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 29, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Recall Technologies v. Palmer Luckey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oculus VR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer Luckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Recall Technologies
Represented By: Brian C. Cannon
Represented By: Robert P. Feldman
Represented By: Robert William Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?