Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC v. 700 Valencia Street LLC

Plaintiff: Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC
Defendant: 700 Valencia Street LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02286
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 27, 2017. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
October 2, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment by Farina Focaccia; and Denying Motion for Summary Judgment by 700 Valencia and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations in related case. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2016)
August 4, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re (94 in 3:15-cv-02286-JCS) Discovery Letter Brief filed by 700 Valencia Street LLC Re: Deposition of Erica McDowell. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero on 8/4/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 15, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero in case 3:15-cv-02286-JCS; granting (47) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 3:15-cv-04931-JCS; July 29, 2016 Motion hearing is vacated. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 14, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL IN LIEU OF JURY TRIAL IN THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION. The bench trial shall be conducted on November 14 and 15, 2016. The jury trial in the unlawful detainer action is vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 14, 2016. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
February 10, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS CLAIMS 37 , DENYING MOTION TO REMAND IN CASE NO. 15-CV-04931 AND DENYING 55 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. The Motion hearing set for February 12, 2016 at 9:30 am is vacated; the Case Management Conference set for the same time shall remain on calendar. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
December 21, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 56 Letter (Motion to Compel) filed by Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
August 25, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 31 Notice (Other) filed by Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC for Earl Bohacheck to appear by phone on 10/16/15.. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/25/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 10 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 22, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DIVERSITY JURISDICTION. Parties to file declarations listing members of LLC and their citizenship by July 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 22, 2015. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by 700 Valencia Street LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/6/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC v. 700 Valencia Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farina Focaccia & Cucina Italiana, LLC
Represented By: Earl Lawrence Bohachek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 700 Valencia Street LLC
Represented By: Kevin Paul Greenquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?