Hunter v. URS Corporation

Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Defendant: URS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv02300
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Transfer Case ; granting 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Michael Hunter. Responses due by 11/6/2015. Replies due by 11/20/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/3/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 21, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Michael Hunter. Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Transfer Case . Responses due by 10/30/2015. Replies due by 11/13/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/20/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
August 26, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference filed by Michael Hunter. Supplemental Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 21, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by URS Corporation. Attorney Richard Keith Chapman terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/11/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. URS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Matt Gilbert Kenna
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: John Soumilas
Represented By: Stephanie R. Tatar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Corporation
Represented By: Richard Keith Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?