Carroll v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Plaintiff: Kelly Carroll
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02321
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2017 234 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 233 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Wells Fargo, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Co. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/1/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
April 10, 2017 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Non-Party Carrie Toldstedt's 171 Motion to Quash. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 13, 2017 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 169 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 14, 2017 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiffs' 181 Motion to Overrule Objections of Non-Party Carrie Toldstedt and Enforce Plaintiffs' subpoena duces tecum; ORDER denying 182 Motion to Shorten Time. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 9, 2017 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 179 2/7/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 7, 2017 176 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Civ. L.R. 6-2; 7-12). Hearing set for Tuesday 7/25/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
January 3, 2017 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 153 Defendants' Motion for Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 9, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 139 11/15/16 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Depositions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 22, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 SETTING FORTH DATA SECURITY PROTOCOLS GOVERNING PRODUCTION AND HANDLING OF CONFIDENTIAL EMPLOYEE DATA filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 4, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 137 10/31/16 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 19, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 133 Carroll's Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel; Denying 134 Layog's Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; and VACATING Hearing on Motions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 7, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Severance and Consolidation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/7/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 8, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 103 , 104 8/18/16 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
July 22, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 73 Motion to Intervene; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 86 Motion to Relate. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 19, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting the parties' 87 Stipulated Protective Order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 14, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 89 7/5/16 Discovery Letter Brief re: Special Interrogatory No. 1. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 8, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 88 Discovery Letter Brief regarding requests for production of documents. The parties shall further meet and confer and, if necessary, file a revised joint letter in the format outlined herein. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 6, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order and [Proposed] Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. The parties are ordered to submit a supporting declaration within 7 days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/6/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 27, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-16-2011-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/27/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
March 4, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Deadline for Mediation, Class Certification Motion and Hearing and Further Case Management Conference filed by Kelly Carroll Case Management Statement due by 11/ 10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 3/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
October 2, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 44 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
August 24, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 \to Reschedule Initial CMC to October 1, 2015 filed by Wells Fargo & Company Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 3, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 2, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NOT RELATING CASES. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignment shall occur. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/2/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 27, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case Reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/27/15. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Carroll
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Richard Lee Alfred
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Represented By: Timothy Mitchell Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Richard Lee Alfred
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Represented By: Timothy Mitchell Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?