Doe v. Selection.com

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Selection.com
Case Number: 3:2015cv02338
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/02/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 10, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CHANGING TIME PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-2 - Deadlines reset as to 37 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 4/12/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Deadlines reset as to 39 Motions for Sanctions. Reply due by 4/18/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Elizabeth D. LaPorte. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
November 4, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 1/7/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 8, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 20 Motion to Stay. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
September 23, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
August 19, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 9/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Selection.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Devin Heng Fok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selection.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?