Wadler v. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sanford S. Wadler
Defendant: Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc., Norman Schwartz, Louis Drapeau, Alice N. Schwartz, Albert J. Hillman and Deborah J. Neff
Case Number: 3:2015cv02356
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2017 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 240 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 240 Motion for New Trial and vacating May 19, 2017 Motion hearing. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
February 6, 2017 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING ON RECONSIDERATION MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON MITIGATION DEFENSE by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 219 Motion for Leave to File. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 207 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Rule 50(a) in favor of Plaintiff as to Mitigation Defense; denying Plaintiff's oral Rule 50 Motion except as to mitigation of damages defense; denying 209 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Rule 50(a). (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
December 20, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 94 Motion to Exclude Protected Information from the Trial of this Action. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
October 17, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Strike. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
December 15, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 57 Motion for Certificate of Appealability and vacating January 8, 2016 hearing (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
October 23, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing Sarbanes-Oxley claim against Defendants Louis Drapeau, Alice N. Schwartz, Albert J. Hillman and Deborah J. Neff with prejudice (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadler v. Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford S. Wadler
Represented By: Kevin Brooke Clune
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Nabity
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Schwartz
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Drapeau
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice N. Schwartz
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Hillman
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah J. Neff
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Linda M. Inscoe
Represented By: Scott Curtis Jones
Represented By: Robert E. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?