Cheetah Mobile, Inc. et al v. APUS Group

Plaintiff: Cheetah Mobile, Inc., Cheetah Mobile America, Inc. and Cheetah Technology Corporation Limited
Defendant: APUS Group
Case Number: 3:2015cv02363
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 63 Motion to Serve by Alternative Means and to Extend Service Deadline; and DENYING 66 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Issued by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/28/2016. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
February 19, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 64 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
October 21, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING QUASHING SERVICE AND GRANTING 56 STIPULATION RE 29 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
July 30, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 STIPULATION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES AND EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
June 15, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 17 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR BIFURCATED BRIEFING OF RULE 12(B) MOTION (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheetah Mobile, Inc. et al v. APUS Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheetah Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Leonard Slenkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheetah Mobile America, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Leonard Slenkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheetah Technology Corporation Limited
Represented By: Keith Leonard Slenkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APUS Group
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Represented By: Ajay Krishnan
Represented By: David Wade Rizk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?