Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Buy Mac Now LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Buy Mac Now LLC, Judy Ann Bahaeddin and Omar Bahaeddin
Case Number: 3:2015cv02367
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
September 10, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/9/2015. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 19, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS The parties shall participate in mediation by the presumptive deadline. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 6, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT Defendants are hereby ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of their answer. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Buy Mac Now LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Jason Robert Vener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buy Mac Now LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Ann Bahaeddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Bahaeddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?