California Capital Insurance Company v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al

Plaintiff: California Capital Insurance Company
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation and Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02377
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Stipulation Requesting Permission to File Amended Complaint & Requesting Remand. (terminating 37 Stipulation)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
January 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/20/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 27 Stipulation RE: Scheduling Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 3, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Amended Stipulation of Parties Re Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
October 8, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2015; Discovery due by 2/19/2016; Motions due by 4/14/2016; Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2016 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/8/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
July 22, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation selecting Private ADR (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Capital Insurance Company v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Capital Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Marshall Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Peter Andrew Dubrawski
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Stephen John Squillario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Peter Andrew Dubrawski
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Stephen John Squillario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?