Perez v. Performance Food Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jorge Perez
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc., Vistar Transportation, LLC and Roma Food Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02390
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION TO TRANSFER.***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
June 22, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Completion; Modify Briefing and Hearing Schedule; Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 36 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 25, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule re 36 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 26, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation Re 29 Amended Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint By 14 Days. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
March 23, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 16 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
August 6, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation Re 15 Clerk's Notice, 16 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Performance Food Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Perez
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vistar Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roma Food Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?