Bronstein et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al

Plaintiff: Irving Bronstein, Troy Bronstein, Maria Christina Taylor and Brian Wright
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02399
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
June 7, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, 38 MOTION to Dismiss [Proposed] Order; Certificate of Service filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 15 Motion to Transfer Case; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
December 21, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARINGS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection; 15 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 6, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 4 Order to Show Cause. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
August 26, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/14/2015 at 2:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2015. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronstein et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Bronstein
Represented By: Adam S Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Bronstein
Represented By: Adam S Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Christina Taylor
Represented By: Adam S Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wright
Represented By: Adam S Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?