Halpern et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Halpern and Celluride Wireless Inc.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Travis Kalanick, Garrett Camp, William Trenchard, Scott Belsky, Bill Gurley, Benchmark Capital, Benchmark, Founder Collective, First Round Capital, Raiser L.L.C. and Raiser CA L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02401
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/29/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 27 STIPULATION re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/17/2015. Replies due by 8/28/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/23/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halpern et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Halpern
Represented By: Quinton Blair Cutlip
Represented By: Christopher B. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celluride Wireless Inc.
Represented By: Quinton Blair Cutlip
Represented By: Christopher B. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kalanick
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Camp
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Trenchard
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Belsky
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gurley
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Capital
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Founder Collective
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Round Capital
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser CA L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?