Smith v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al

Plaintiff: Kellie Smith
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District, Kenton Rainey, Benson H. Fairow and Michael Maes
Case Number: 3:2015cv02402
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/13/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
August 31, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Further Settlement Issues and Vacating Dates. Status Report due by 12/5/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/16. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
July 18, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
September 4, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION AND REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement. Discovery due by 5/30/2016. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Smith
Represented By: Eustace De Saint Phalle
Represented By: Joseph Rockne Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benson H. Fairow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Maes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?