Johnson v. Alameda County Sheriff's Department

Plaintiff: Etta Johnson
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2015cv02418
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SEALED TRANSCRIPT OR FTR AUDIO RECORDING as to 36 Further Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/2/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/3015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
August 21, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting Defendant County of Alameda's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint by September 30, 2015.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?