Townsend v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Alicia Townsend
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv02422
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL 60 DAYORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/9/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 2, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 23 Notice (Other), filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, for Brian S. Thomley to appear by phone on 11/6/15 at 2:00PM. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/2/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
August 24, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 8/18/15. *Reposted with signature.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
July 20, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 13 Notice (Other) filed by Alicia Townsend for Robert Levy to appear by phone on 9/4/15 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/20/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 6, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 11 Notice (Other), filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC for Brian Thomley to appear by phone on 9/4/15 at 2:00 PM. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/6/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Townsend
Represented By: Robert Ian Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Represented By: Brian Scott Thomley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?