J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aranda

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Victor Acosta Aranda
Case Number: 3:2015cv02451
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Victor Acosta Aranda, individually and d/b/a El Tapatio Restaurant filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 27, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 47 Notice of Settlement filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal or Statement due by 9/12/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 22, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER RE: HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
November 4, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 11/25/2015. Mediation deadline 2/5/2016. Expert disclosures 4/8/2016. Expert rebuttal 4/22/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 5/6/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 5/6/2016. Deadline t o file dispositive motions 5/27/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 8/9/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 9/6/2016 - 9/8/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
September 21, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference; and Order (Proposed) filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Acosta Aranda
Represented By: Matthew Allen Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?