Wild Equity Institute v. United States Environmental Protection Agency

Plaintiff: Wild Equity Institute
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2015cv02461
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 19 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
September 30, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/30/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/29/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild Equity Institute v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild Equity Institute
Represented By: Matt Gilbert Kenna
Represented By: Brent Plater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?