Migdal v. AMCO Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mark Migdal
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02496
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
March 10, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 3/10/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
February 17, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY AND MOTION DEADLINES. Fact discovery cutoff: 6/10/2016. Dispositive motions to be heard by 8/8/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 8, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON 23 MOTION TO WITHDRAW - Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2016. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing reset for 3/9/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve copies of this Order on Mr. Migdal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 23 MOTION TO WITHDRAW - Motion Hearing rescheduled for 3/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick (to coincide with Case Management Conference). Plaintiff Mark Migdal shall appear at the hearing. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION RESCHEDULING FEBRUARY 16, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
September 9, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/09/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Migdal v. AMCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Migdal
Represented By: Robert Brian Robards
Represented By: Gaurav Deep Sharma
Represented By: Andrew Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?