Perez v. Santa Cruz, City of et al
Plaintiff: Gerardo Perez
Defendant: Santa Cruz, City of, Mark Eveleth, David Forbus, Denise Cockrum and Dominic Guerrasio
Case Number: 3:2015cv02527
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 42 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/5/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order re: 37 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/21/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANGEMENT ORDER re 23 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 02/02/2017 at 9:00 am. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 5/8/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. B eth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2017, 5/9/2017, 5/10/2017, 5/12/2017, 5/15/2017, 5/16/2017, 5/17/2017, and 5/19/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/05/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Santa Cruz, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Perez
Represented By: Matthew S. McNicholas
Represented By: Justin D. Nussen
Represented By: Douglas Davis Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz, City of
Represented By: George J. Kovacevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Eveleth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Forbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Cockrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Guerrasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?