CTIA - The Wireless Association v. City of Berkeley et al

Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Defendant: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III, Christine Daniel and City of Berkeley
Amicus Curiae: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Interested Party: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2015cv02529
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Jensen (Jensen, Christopher) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 10/3/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2019.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 129 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 128 MANDATE of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 127 USCA Opinion as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association; affirmed. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 126 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to stayed status of case, Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/201 is vacated and rescheduled for 8/1/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 125 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 124 CLERK'S NOTICE: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 5/29/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
October 25, 2018 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/25/2018. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 2 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Joshua Dick. Defendant Attorney: Jerome Mayer-Cantu. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu (Mayer-Cantu, Jerome) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 121 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 120 U.S. Supreme Court Notice re Judgment as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 118 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 117 U.S. Supreme Court Notice as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association that the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for further consideration. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 116 USCA Opinion as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association; affirmed. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/22/2018 to 7/19/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 114 Further JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/15/2018) Modified on 6/19/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2018 Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/21/2018 to Friday 6/22/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 111 FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 110 U.S. Supreme Court Notice that the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on January 9, 2018 and placed on the docket January 9, 2018 as No. 17-976 as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
January 18, 2018 Case Stayed (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/18/2018. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time: 11:38-11:45. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 108 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT : CORRECTION OF DOCKET #107 filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 107 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
November 27, 2017 Filing 106 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference reset from 10:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m. on 1/18/2018 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to set up the conference call. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/24/2017. Status Report due by 1/11/2018. Telephone Conference - Status re: Petition for Certiorari or Scheduling Cross-Motion(s) for Summary Judgment set for 1/18/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Joshua Dick. Defendant Attorney: Savith Iyengar. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 104 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #103 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 103 MANDATE of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 102 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER of USCA The petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearingen banc, filed May 5, 2017, are DENIED as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 100 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further Case Management Conference from 10/5/2017 to 10/24/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE by CTIA - The Wireless Association Re: Ninth Circuit En Banc Procedure (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/5/2017. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 10:37-10:40. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting Theodore Olson's #96 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 95 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 94 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 7/6/2017 to Wednesday 7/5/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 93 USCA Opinion as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association; affirmed. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/22/2017 to 7/6/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/23/2017 to 6/22/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 90 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
November 23, 2016 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/22/2016. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 2:20-2:22. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further Case Management Conference from 10:30 a.m. to 2:00 p.m. on 11/22/2016 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 87 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 12/1/2016 to 11/22/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/12/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. See minute for details.FTR Time 10:52 to 10:57. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #83 for Leave for Out-of-Town Counsel to Appear Telephonically at May 12, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Leave for Out-of-Town Counsel to Appear Telephonically at May 12, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 82 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 80 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 4/14/2016 to 5/12/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 79 Transcript Designation Form (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER of USCA as to #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 77 USCA Case Number 16-15141 for #76 Notice of Appeal filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. Appeal of Order on Motion #74 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10179136 paid.) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 2/1/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-15141)
February 1, 2016 Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #59 Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 73 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/21/16, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #70 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #70 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City and County of San Francisco for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by CTIA - The Wireless Association for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2016 re #59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Total Time in Court 39. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney Joshua Lipshutz and Joshua Dick. Defendant Attorney Amanda Shanor and Zach Cowan. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 68 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 67 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND CMC filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference reset for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND CMC filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 64 REPLY (re #59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCity of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Motion/Further CMC from 2:30 p.m. to 1:00 p.m. on 12/22/15 re #59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 60 Proposed Order re #59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION Dissolve Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/1/2015. Replies due by 12/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Dissolve, #2 Exhibit A to Numainville Dec)(Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Case Management Conference held on 10/1/2015. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2015. Further Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:05.48 - 10:23.06. Plaintiff Attorney: Joshua Dick, Joshua Lipshutz. Defendant Attorney: Zack Cowan.Attorneys by telephone:(P) Lawrence Lessig, Amanda Shanor (D) Helgi Walker (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #56 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE FOR OUT-OF-TOWN COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 1, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Leave for Out-of-Town Counsel to Appear Telephonically at October 1, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 24, 2015 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Vacate October 1, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (denied). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Granting #36 NRDC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Vacate October 1, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City and County of San Francisco for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 50 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/20/15, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #48 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (Related documents(s) #48 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by CTIA - The Wireless Association for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Spencer, Jacob) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2015 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association, #36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. Court took matter under submission and to issue order.Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 46 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCity of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Crazy Ely v. City of Las Vegas)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 45 Statement re #33 Opposition/Response to Motion, OF RECENT DECISION by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Recent Decision Nat'l Ass'n v. SEC Aug 18 2015)(Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 44 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 43 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 42 Brief re #39 Opposition/Response to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY (re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Wall, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 40 REPLY (re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCity of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 39 RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 38 REPLY (re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE.Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco, CA before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015) Modified on 7/15/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief of Natural Resources Defense Council in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Wall, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 6, 2015 Filing 34 Declaration of Om Ghandi in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 7/6/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2015 Filing 33 RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCity of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Tom Jensen, #2 Exhibit Exh. A to Decl. of Tom Jensen, #3 Declaration Decl. of Anthony B. Miller, #4 Declaration Decl. of Sandra Cortesi, #5 Declaration Decl. of Om Ghandi)(Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 32 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Amanda Shanor ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9645281.) filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service appearance pro hac vice)(Shanor, Amanda) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint byCity of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 22, 2015 Filing 27 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice 3:15-cv-2529 ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9617035.) filed by Lester Lawrence Lessig, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Admission/Good Standing)(Lessig, Lester) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Cowan as Counsel for Defendants (Cowan, Zachary) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTIA - The Wireless Association re #21 Case Management Scheduling Order, #22 Order (Dick, Joshua) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association Motion Hearing reset for 8/20/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 7/6/2015. Replies due by 7/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay and Briefing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 12, 2015 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTIA - The Wireless Association re #9 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9580580.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/08/15, #7 Summons Issued, #11 Notice of Appearance, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Notice of Appearance, #12 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #1 Complaint, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #8 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9580617.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/08/15 (Dick, Joshua) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay and Briefing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 9, 2015. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz as Counsel for Plaintiff (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CTIA - The Wireless Association.. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Dick (Dick, Joshua) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Huston (Huston, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 9 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Helgi C. Walker (Filing fee $305, receipt number 0971-9580580.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/08/15 filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Walker, Helgi) (Filed on 6/8/2015) Modified on 6/9/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2015 Filing 8 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Jabcob T. Spencer (Filing fee $305, receipt number 0971-9580617.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/08/15 filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. (Spencer, Jacob) (Filed on 6/8/2015) Modified on 6/9/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2015 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. Responses due by 6/22/2015. Replies due by 6/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by CTIA - The Wireless Association (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9579800.). Filed byCTIA - The Wireless Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTIA - The Wireless Association v. City of Berkeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Daniel
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Amanda Shanor
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Represented By: Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Amanda Shanor
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Represented By: Jerome Philippe Mayer-Cantu
Represented By: Christopher D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: Helgi C Walker
Represented By: Michael R. Huston
Represented By: Jacob T Spencer
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore B Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?