Robertson v. Contra Costa County et al

Plaintiff: Randy David Ray Robertson
Defendant: Contra Costa County and David O. Livingston
Case Number: 3:2015cv02549
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
September 14, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND COUNTY DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER AND PLAINTIFFS TIME FOR MOVING TO STRIKE THE OPERATIVE ANSWER by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 52 Stipulation. County Defendants' deadline to file an A mended Answer is extended to October 14, 2016. Plaintiff Robertson's deadline to file a motion to strike County Defendants' operative answer is extended to 21 days after County Defendants file an Amended Answer, or to November 4, 2016 in the event County Defendants do not file an Amended Answer.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 8, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 STIPULATION extending deadlines re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Response due by 6/23/2016. Reply due by 6/30/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 7/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
April 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 20 Amended Complaint filed by Randy David Ray Robertson. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/15/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy David Ray Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?