Fraizer v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al

Plaintiff: Regina Fraizer
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Martha G. Bronitsky
Case Number: 3:2015cv02559
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
September 2, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/2/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 14, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2015. The hearing set for 8/19/2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/14/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraizer v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Fraizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha G. Bronitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?