Workman v. Plum, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn Workman
Defendant: Plum Inc. and Campbell Soup Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02568
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 16, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 2, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 STIPULATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 31, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION SETTING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DATE TOTHE COMPLAINT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 24, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 14 21 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR A LIMITED STAY PENDING EARLY MEDIATION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 14, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/14/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman v. Plum, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Workman
Represented By: Robert J. Berg
Represented By: Jeffrey Ian Carton
Represented By: Robyn Carrico Crowther
Represented By: Cameron Johnson
Represented By: Lennette Wen Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plum Inc.
Represented By: Keri Elizabeth Borders
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company
Represented By: Keri Elizabeth Borders
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?