Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and Burns & Wilcox Insurance Services
Case Number: 3:2015cv02592
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
September 15, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING BURNS & WILCOX INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE MOTION TO PERMIT FILING OF SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 124 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
August 22, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 74 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
July 8, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING BURNS & WILCOX'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 76 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 13, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
January 13, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JUDICIAL NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 8, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 15, 2016 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 2, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS REFORMATION COUNT IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 38 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
September 3, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS 20 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns & Wilcox Insurance Services
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?