Pannone v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patricia Pannone
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02607
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 22, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016) Modified on 2/22/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/21/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
July 29, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/17/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 9, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pannone v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Pannone
Represented By: Michael James Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?