Fernandez v. Brink's Incorporated

Plaintiff: Ernie Ricardo Fernandez
Defendant: Brink's Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2015cv02667
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Status Report. Further Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/23/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
November 24, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATIONT O CONTINUE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2016. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
August 25, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, MOTION TO DISMISS OR TO STAY AND DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, MOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
June 30, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Brink's Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Ricardo Fernandez
Represented By: Brent Alan Robinson
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink's Incorporated
Represented By: Becki Diana Graham
Represented By: Spencer C. Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?