McBride v. Pentagon Technologies Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Frank A McBride, III
Defendant: Pentagon Technologies Group, Inc., Baird Capital Partners Management Company III LLC, BCP III Affiliates Fund Limited Partnership, Baird Capital Partners III Limited Partnership and BCP III Special Affiliates Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2015cv02696
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 67 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Expert Discovery due by 11/11/2016. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
April 21, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 63 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/21/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
February 25, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
January 28, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/28/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
December 22, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong denying 4 and 9 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride v. Pentagon Technologies Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentagon Technologies Group, Inc.
Represented By: Tad A. Devlin
Represented By: Andrew J. Dorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baird Capital Partners Management Company III LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCP III Affiliates Fund Limited Partnership
Represented By: Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baird Capital Partners III Limited Partnership
Represented By: Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCP III Special Affiliates Limited Partnership
Represented By: Douglas M. Mansfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A McBride, III
Represented By: Fordham E Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?