Hall v. Spiller et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Matthew Hall
Defendant: Dave Spiller, Mark Reimer, Ryan Tajague, wilson and Steve Ayers
Case Number: 3:2015cv02706
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/30/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
December 2, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 27 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiff to file second amended complaint no later than 1/29/16. REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Westmore to conduct mandatory settlement conference no later than 1/22/16. Case Management Conference set 1/25/2016 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
September 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 16 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. The hearing set for October 13, 2015 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 10, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/15/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2015 is CONTINUED to 10/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/10/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Spiller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Matthew Hall
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Tajague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?