Tulare Local Health Care District et al v. California Department of Health Care Services et al

Petitioner: Tulare Local Health Care District, Enloe Medical Center, El CentroRegional Medical Center, Willits Hospital, Inc., Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc., Sonora Community Hospital, Inc., Reedley Community Hospital, Placentia-Linda Hospital, Inc., San Ramon Regional Medical Center, LLC, Doctor's Hospital of Manteca, Inc., San Jose Healthcare System, LP, West Hills Hospital and Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District
Respondent: California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent
Case Number: 3:2015cv02711
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; ORDER Vacating Hearing Date. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
May 11, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 44 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by San Ramon Regional Medical Center, LLC, Doctor's Hospital of Manteca, Inc., Sonora Community Hospital, Inc., Pioneers Memorial Healt hcare District, Reedley Community Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Placentia-Linda Hospital, Inc., Jennifer Kent, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Willits Hospital, Inc., Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc., West Hills Hospital, San Jose Healthcare System, LP, El Centro Regional Medical Center, Tulare Local Health Care District, El CentroRegional Medical Center. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
November 6, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 24 Order Reassigning Case. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
September 17, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/17/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 9, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 4 Motion to Remand (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 18, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Respondents California Department of Health Care Services, et al. are ORDERED to submit a supplemental brief of no more than three (3) pages within seven (7) days pursuant to this order. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/18/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tulare Local Health Care District et al v. California Department of Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tulare Local Health Care District
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enloe Medical Center
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: El CentroRegional Medical Center
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willits Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ukiah Adventist Hospital
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonora Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reedley Community Hospital
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Placentia-Linda Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: San Ramon Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doctor's Hospital of Manteca, Inc.
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: San Jose Healthcare System, LP
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: West Hills Hospital
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Kent
Represented By: Carolyn Ortler Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?