K.H. v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security

Plaintiff: K.H.
Defendant: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2015cv02740
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. Redacted Version. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
April 25, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 Errata re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, filed by Jeffrey Boyer, Brian Pierog, W. L., Donna Baxter, C. V., Richard DeVivo, Karnel McMahan, Kristen Pavkovich, Gary McConaghy, K.H., J. M. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
February 23, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
December 7, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing S. Hunt's and J. Tate's Claims filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
August 16, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Schedule filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Deadline for Dispositive Motion Depositions 12/26/2016. Filing Deadline for Defendant's S ummary Judgment Motion due 2/3/2017. Filing Deadline for Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion 3/3/2017. Filing Deadline for Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment Motion 3/29/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures due 9/6/2017. Defendant's Expert Disclosures due 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 18, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPROVE NOTICE OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY CLASS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 43 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 15, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Production of Third-Party Information filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
May 13, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Dismissal filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 27, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 43 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Notice of Collective Action and To Conditionally Certify Class filed by Jeffrey Boyer, Brian Pierog, W. L., Donna Baxter, C. V., Richard DeVivo, Karnel McMahan, Kristen Pavkovich, Gary McConaghy, K.H., J. M. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 12, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME filed by Jeffrey Boyer, Brian Pierog, W. L., Donna Baxter, C. V., Richard DeVivo, Karnel McMahan, Kristen Pavkovich, Gary McConaghy, K.H., J. M. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 14, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 36 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike First Amended Complaint filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 25, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Sensitive Security Information (Revised) filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 29 Stipulation Re Sensitive Security Information, 49 C.F.R. Part 152. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 30, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Schedule filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Start of Fact Discovery 12/1/2015. Amended Complaint due 1/15/2016. Response to Amended Compl aint due 2/15/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Plaintiff's Class Experts due 5/2/2016. Defendant's Class Experts due 7/1/2016. Deadline for Class Expert Depositions 9/1/2016. Deadline for Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion 10/6/2016. Responses due 11/3/2016. Replies due 12/1/2016. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 16, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
September 15, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CMC re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.H. v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.H.
Represented By: Nicholas Michael Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?