Perez v. TLC Residential Inc et al

Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: TLC Residential Inc and Francisco Montero
Case Number: 3:2015cv02776
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2017 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 185 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
April 6, 2017 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 177 MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 4, 2017 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 177 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/2017. Responses due by 4/7/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
February 14, 2017 157 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE 156 RMKB'S LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 154 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE 152 RMKB'S LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 6, 2017 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 146 147 DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/6/2017. Responses due by 2/13/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 18, 2017 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 131 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 28, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 16, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES (pursuant to 118 stipulation). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 7, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 1, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RETAIN NEW COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 21, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 60 89 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 5, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup 99 . (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 16, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/16/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 12, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXTENSION Replies due by 9/8/2016. Responses due by 9/1/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
June 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
April 19, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 33 35 36 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS; MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND VACATING HEARING. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 6, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING Responses due by 4/11/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 1, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 2, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 43 STIPULATION TO MOVE HEARING DATE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 1, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
December 21, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 16, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/16/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 20, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIMEFOR TLC RESIDENTIAL, INC. ANDFRANCISCO MONTERO TO AMENDANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSESAND COUNTERCLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
August 31, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TLC RESIDENTIAL, INC. AND FRANCISCO MONTERO TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF THOMAS E. PEREZ, SECRETARY OF LABORS COMPLAINT 11 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 7, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 2, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. TLC Residential Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Cheryl L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Residential Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?