Tangle, Inc. v. Magic Time International Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Tangle, Inc.
Defendant: Magic Time International Ltd. and Brown Sales & Marketing LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02802
Filed: June 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/14/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
January 13, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Early Neutral Evaluation Deadline. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2016. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re: 30 Motion to Dismiss set for 3/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 1, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 STIPULATION to continue CMC and hearing date as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016. Case Management Conference set and Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/1/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 13, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 STIPULATION re extension to file reply to 30 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply deadline extended to 11/16/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 5, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Consent MOTION to Continue. Hearing as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss and Case Management Conference continued to 12/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/5/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
September 17, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Statement and Conference Dates and Allow Filing of Second Amended Complaint in Lieu of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangle, Inc. v. Magic Time International Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangle, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria E. Brieant
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Time International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Sales & Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?