Gino Emmerich v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Gino Emmerich
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Officer Doe #1, Officer Doe #2, Officer Doe #3 and Officer Doe #4
Case Number: 3:2015cv02914
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
January 8, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/08/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
November 9, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/9/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
August 27, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference and related deadlines continued. Case Management Conference will be conducted 11/24/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2015. It is further ordered, that Plaintiff is allowed to immediately issue a subpoena duces tecum pursuant to Rule 45 in order to obtain any recorded video or photographic footage of the July 27, 2014 incident. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/27/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gino Emmerich v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino Emmerich
Represented By: Michael Millen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?