Davis v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Will Davis
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02920
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss Action. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/12/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/20/2017 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/13/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 39 Motion for Class Certification.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER 36 EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION FOR 30 DAYS AND MOVING CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING DATE. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 9/22/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 34 TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE 14 MOTION TO DISMISS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Davis
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?