Siskin v. Fownes Brothers & Co, Incorporated

Plaintiff: David R. Siskin
Defendant: Fownes Brothers & Co, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2015cv02922
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 21, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Notice of Pending Settlement and Stipulation Requesting Continuation of Deadlines Pending Settlement. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
July 6, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/6/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 2, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (JSW) immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will be rescheduled by the Court. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siskin v. Fownes Brothers & Co, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Siskin
Represented By: Marcel F. De Armas
Represented By: Jayson Singh Sohi
Represented By: David T. Wei, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fownes Brothers & Co, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?