Center for Environmental Health et al v. McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health, Beyond Pesticides and Physicians for Social Responsibility
Defendant: Gina McCarthy and U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2015cv02939
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING 30 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
November 19, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Cross-motions for summary judgment will be heard on 6/8/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
August 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 STIPULATION to Replace Case Management Orders. Parties' briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment is adopted. Cross motions will be heard 5/11/2016 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 4, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/4/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES - The case of Center for Environmental Health, et al. v. McCarthy, et al., No. 3:15-cv-02939-LB is not related to the present case under Local Rule 3-12. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED, and the new case shall be assigned according to normal procedures. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 13, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/13/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Environmental Health et al v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Amelia Yana Garcia
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beyond Pesticides
Represented By: Amelia Yana Garcia
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: Amelia Yana Garcia
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?