Adobe Sysems Incorporated v. Focus Camera, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adobe Sysems Incorporated
Defendant: Focus Camera, LLC and Focus Camera, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02949
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
September 25, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2015 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/25/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
July 2, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Sysems Incorporated v. Focus Camera, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Sysems Incorporated
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Jason Robert Vener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Camera, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Camera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?