ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan Board of Trustees et al v. Connecticut General Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan Board of Trustees and ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company, SHPS Holdings, Inc., SHPS, Inc., Carewise Health, Inc., SHPS Health Management Solutions, Inc. and SHPS Human Resource Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02965
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 89 ) by Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 9, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 120 DEFENDANT'S LETTER OBJECTION DATED FEBRUARY 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
February 22, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 115 PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
January 24, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 85 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Hon. William Alsup. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 19, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/19/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017).
January 17, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/17/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
December 9, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 22, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 69 MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AND BAR ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/22/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 21, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CANCELLING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 14, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2016. Discovery Hearing set for 11/23/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 7, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 70 JOINT REQUESTS FOR MORE DEPOSITIONS AND 71 TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND TRIAL DATE by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
April 4, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 67 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
February 11, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 55 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
December 22, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS Motions seeking leave to amend due by 1/5/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/22/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 2, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
October 25, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING OMNIBUS OPPOSITION BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 39 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2015)
October 20, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MARK B. BLOCKER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 19, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MARK B. BLOCKER by Hon. William Alsup denying 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 13, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 18, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 4, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint, Time to File Motion or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint, and Setting Briefing Schedule on Any Motion Filed in Response to Amended Complaint filed by ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan Board of Trustees, ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
July 8, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/8/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan Board of Trustees et al v. Connecticut General Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan Board of Trustees
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Kevin John Lesinski
Represented By: Lindsay Rose Nicholas
Represented By: Petra M. Reinecke
Represented By: Peter Warren Saltzman
Represented By: Douglas Robert Schwartz
Represented By: Eric Michael Steinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILWU-PMA Welfare Plan
Represented By: Jonathan A Braunstein
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: D. Ward Kallstrom
Represented By: Kevin John Lesinski
Represented By: Lindsay Rose Nicholas
Represented By: Petra M. Reinecke
Represented By: Peter Warren Saltzman
Represented By: Douglas Robert Schwartz
Represented By: Eric Michael Steinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHPS Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHPS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carewise Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHPS Health Management Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHPS Human Resource Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?