Gauthier v. Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC et al

Appellant: Margaret Lucy Gauthier
Appellee: Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC, Seterus, Inc and Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oakland and Michael Kasolas
Case Number: 3:2015cv02973
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT'S DENIAL OF MOTION FOR CONTEMPT, Motions terminated: 23 MOTION to Continue filed by Margaret Lucy Gauthier, 13 MOTION to Stay filed by Margaret Lucy Gauthier.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 10, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 5, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CHAMBERS COPIES Chambers copies due by 11/9/2015.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/5/2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
September 28, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier v. Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margaret Lucy Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Doonan, Graves & Longoria LLC
Represented By: Joshua Louis Scheer
Represented By: Spencer Paul Scheer
Represented By: Jonathan Seigel
Represented By: Reilly Dennis Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seterus, Inc
Represented By: Darren John Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R
Represented By: Leslie Marie Klott
Represented By: Brian Huy Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Michael Kasolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?