Williams v. People of the State of California et al

Petitioner: Charles Lee Williams
Respondent: People of the State of California, Dianne Hyatt, Roy Hashimoto, Roy Scheingart, David Byron, Winifred Smith, Michelle S. and Elvin Valenzuela
Case Number: 3:2015cv03013
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. The "Objection" is denied, as plaintiff fails to identify any cognizable basis for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 20, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Having reviewed de novo the matters raised in plaintiff's petition, this Court adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition is dismissed without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 6, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. Case 04-117 MMC is related to case 15-3013 JCS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 6, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
October 27, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re Case Nos. 04-cv-0117, 06-cv-5825, and 09-cv-3194. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 27, 2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 5, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/6/2015 02:00 PM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/5/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. People of the State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Lee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dianne Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roy Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roy Scheingart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Winifred Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elvin Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?