Henderson v. Select Portfolio Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Donavon Henderson
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, American Mortgage Express Corp. and Bank of America , N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03028
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James Donato on April 29, 2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
March 17, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato granting 11 and 17 Motions to Dismiss. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
November 17, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/17/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
July 7, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Select Portfolio Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donavon Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Express Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?