American Airlines Flow-Thru Pilots Coalition et al v. Allied Pilots Association et al

Plaintiff: American Airlines Flow-Thru Pilots Coalition, Gregory R Cordes, Dru Marquart, Phhilip Valente, Doug Poulton and Stephan Robson
Defendant: Allied Pilots Association and American Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03125
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding the parties' 93 8/31/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 16, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
June 27, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 68 Leave to Seek Reconsideration and Setting a Briefing Schedule. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 20, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 40 American Airlines' Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
December 17, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 28 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
October 8, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Scheduling Order. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Airlines Flow-Thru Pilots Coalition et al v. Allied Pilots Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Airlines Flow-Thru Pilots Coalition
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R Cordes
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dru Marquart
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phhilip Valente
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Poulton
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Robson
Represented By: Christopher W. Katzenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?