Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc. et al v. Barri Electric Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc., Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust, San Francisco Electrical Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Electrical Workers Health and Welfare Trust, National Electric Benefit Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6 Vacation Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6 and John Doherty
Defendant: Barri Electric Company, Inc. and Ernest Ulibarri
Case Number: 3:2015cv03131
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT re: 29 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/26/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 25, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE re 29 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 12, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER Defendant's jury demand due by 1/18/2016. Bench Trial set for 2/1/2016 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 7, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING JUDGMENT AND SETTING HEARING re 22 Objection, filed by Barri Electric Company, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT JUDGMENT, Motions terminated: 19 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/4/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 18, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AMENDED STIPULATION OF CONTINGENT DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 17, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Order Responses due by 11/17/2015 at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 10, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE STIPULATION OF CONTINGENT DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 19, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
July 8, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/8/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc. et al v. Barri Electric Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Electrical Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electric Benefit Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doherty
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barri Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Ulibarri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?