Hughlett v. Marine Terminals Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Ed Hughlett
Defendant: Marine Terminals Corp., Ports America Shared Services, Inc. and Greg Barker
Case Number: 3:2015cv03139
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 8, 2015. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 3, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 Administrative MOTION to Continue Hearing Date. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 8, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/8/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughlett v. Marine Terminals Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Hughlett
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Scott M Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Terminals Corp.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Boca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ports America Shared Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Boca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Barker
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Boca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?